MD HB398 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the driver of a vehicle to drive on the left side of the roadway in a no-passing zone to overtake and pass at a safe distance a bicycle, an Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device (EPAMD), or a motor scooter traveling in the same direction if the vehicle is driven in accordance with certain provisions of law and the driver reasonably believes, based on certain conditions, that the adjustment does not endanger, impede, or interfere with another vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws – Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, EPAMDs, or Motor Scooters

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01SenateUnfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-08SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {740012/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-01-31HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback