MD HB4 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB261
Note: Carry Over of previous HB112
Note: Carry Over of previous HB112
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an Executive Branch agency from banning or regulating the sale of coffee in conjunction with a career exploration and development activity in any public high school in Baltimore County, if the activity is directed at or organized by students with individualized education programs; and repealing a certain exception that prohibited banning or regulating the sale of coffee in a Baltimore County public high school that sold coffee on or before June 30, 2018, in conjunction with a career exploration activity.
Title
Baltimore County - Career Exploration and Development Activities in Public High Schools - Prohibiting a Ban or Regulation of Sale of Coffee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2021-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {155967/1 Adopted |
2021-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2020-09-18 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB4 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
HB112 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB112 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Baltimore County
Continuing Education
Education - Local Bills
Food
Job Training
Public Schools
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Special Education
Continuing Education
Education - Local Bills
Food
Job Training
Public Schools
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Special Education