MD HB401 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a Class B license to include an off-sale privilege under specified circumstances; creating in Baltimore City a refillable container license; authorizing the Board of Liquor License Commissioners to issue the license to a holder of any class of alcoholic beverages license issued by the Board except a Class C license and a Class M-G license; specifying that a holder of the license may sell draft beer for consumption off the license premises in a specified refillable container to specified individuals; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (134-1) | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments 803893/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-01 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Advertising
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Beverage Containers
Fees
Hearings
Labeling
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notices
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Beverage Containers
Fees
Hearings
Labeling
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notices
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations