MD HB402 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the enforcement authority of the Department of the Environment under various provisions of law, including provisions relating to waterway construction and dam safety, tidal and nontidal wetlands, drinking water, and waterworks, wastewater works, and industrial wastewater works; requiring certain penalties collected by the Department to be paid into the Maryland Clean Water Fund; etc.
Title
Department of the Environment - Enforcement Authority
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m. |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB221 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-22 - Referred Environment and Transportation
Subjects
Attorney General
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Clerks of Court
Counties
Emergencies
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Evidence
Federal Government
Fees
Health
Hearings
Injury
Liability
Liens
Municipal Corporations
Natural Resources
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Personal Property
Real Property
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Sewage
Subpoenas
Testimony
Time
Water
Witnesses
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Clerks of Court
Counties
Emergencies
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Evidence
Federal Government
Fees
Health
Hearings
Injury
Liability
Liens
Municipal Corporations
Natural Resources
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Personal Property
Real Property
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Sewage
Subpoenas
Testimony
Time
Water
Witnesses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 12 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 12 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 12 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 12 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 12 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 12 | 505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 16 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 5 | 514 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 5 | 515 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 5 | 909 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 5 | 911 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1024 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1025 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1026 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1026.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 412 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 413 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0402?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0402f.pdf |