MD HB408 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that a person is prohibited from knowingly and willfully assuming the identity of a fictitious person to avoid identification, apprehension, or prosecution for a crime, or with fraudulent intent, to get a benefit, credit, good, service, or any other thing of value or to avoid the payment of debt or other legal obligation; and providing penalties for a violation of the Act.
Title
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Assumption of Identity of Fictitious Person
Sponsors
Del. Tiffany Alston [D] | Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Del. Susan Aumann [R] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
Del. John Cluster [R] | Del. Frank Conaway [D] | Del. Susan McComas [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-11 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-10 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2011-03-08 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-08 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-07 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Judiciary |