MD HB408 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-10 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-10 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the circumstances under which a police officer is required to charge by citation; modifying the categories of offenses for which a police officer is authorized to charge by citation; and modifying the circumstances under which a police officer may charge a defendant by citation to include a defendant subject to arrest for another alleged misdemeanor involving serious injury or immediate health risk, an alleged felony related to the same incident, or an open warrant.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-16) (Y: 122 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-16) |
2017-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {272719/2 Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2017-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-26 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Citations
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Vandalism
Warrants
Citations
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Vandalism
Warrants