MD HB408 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 539
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 539
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission to establish a Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program for replacement of certain pipes on certain property; requiring the Program to include certain eligibility requirements; requiring the Program to include a requirement regarding notification or certification of an active leak; requiring the Program to provide for loan terms and conditions, including a certain interest rate; requiring the Program to provide loans on a certain basis; terminating the program; etc.
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program PG/MC 103-18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 539 |
2018-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Bi-County Agencies
Counties
Emergencies
Equipment
Interest
Liens
Loans
Local Government Mandates
Mortgages
Notices
Plumbing
Real Property
Sunset
Utilities
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Water
Counties
Emergencies
Equipment
Interest
Liens
Loans
Local Government Mandates
Mortgages
Notices
Plumbing
Real Property
Sunset
Utilities
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Water