MD HB408 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB345
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that any gas service newly installed at an occupied structure may have a gas service regulator installed only outside the structure; requiring an existing interior gas service regulator in a multifamily residential structure to be relocated outside whenever a gas service line or regulator is replaced; requiring a gas company, on or before January 1, 2021, to file a plan with the Public service Commission to relocate any gas service regulator that provides service to a multifamily residential structure; etc.
Title
Public Utilities - Gas Service Regulator Safety (Flower Branch Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m. |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-41) |
2020-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {973594/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-23 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
HB408 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Subjects
Apartments
Condominiums
Energy Matters
Equipment
Fuel
Higher Education
Highways
Hotels and Motels
Housing
Parking
Real Property
Religion
Residential Property
Safety
Timesharing
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Condominiums
Energy Matters
Equipment
Fuel
Higher Education
Highways
Hotels and Motels
Housing
Parking
Real Property
Religion
Residential Property
Safety
Timesharing
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |