MD HB415 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, in Montgomery and Prince George's counties, each public utility that provides electricity, gas, or water and sewer services to establish a certain policy and process for administering the public services in conjunction with a property manager for certain managed property; authorizing a property manager to act on behalf of the owner to perform certain activities in relation to utility services; requiring a property manager to provide certain notice to a public utility; etc.
Title
Montgomery and Prince George's Counties - Public Utilities - Property Management PG/MC 109-18
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2018-01-30 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Apartments
Bi-County Agencies
Condominiums
Landlord and Tenant
Montgomery County
Notices
Prince George's County
Real Property
Records
Rules and Regulations
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Bi-County Agencies
Condominiums
Landlord and Tenant
Montgomery County
Notices
Prince George's County
Real Property
Records
Rules and Regulations
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Washington Suburban Sanitary District