MD HB417 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting retirees of the Employees' Retirement and Pension Systems from a reemployment earnings limitation for up to 3 years when the retiree's previous employer, the State of Maryland, rehires the retiree not later than December 31, 2022, to assist with the administration of federally funded grants or benefits related to the COVID-19 pandemic; and applying the Act retroactively to January 1, 2020.
Title
Employees' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment Earnings Limitation - COVID-19 Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57 |
2022-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2022-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {803427/1 Adopted |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2022-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-01 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB402 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Subjects
COVID-19
Emergency Bills
Health
Retirement
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Sunset
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Emergency Bills
Health
Retirement
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Sunset
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment