MD HB418 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education to conduct a specified analysis regarding the Child Care Subsidy Program beginning in 2017 and every 2 years thereafter; requiring the Department to consult with specified entities before conducting a specified analysis; and requiring the Department to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before September 1, 2017, and by September 1 every 2 years thereafter.
Title
Child Care Subsidy Program - Reimbursement Rate Adjustments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209 |
2017-03-27 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2017-02-21 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-21 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-20 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-26 | House | First Reading Appropriations |