MD HB421 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the calculation of workers' compensation death benefits for a dependent of a deceased covered employee who died due to an occupational disease.
Title
Workers' Compensation - Death Benefits - Determination of Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-28 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-28 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-03 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2012-03-21 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-16 | First Reading Finance | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-16 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | |
2012-03-14 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-14 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-02-07 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-01 | First Reading Economic Matters |