MD HB433 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 724
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 724
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from four to five the number of full-time assistant sheriffs provided to the Sheriff of Prince George's County; and providing that the Fraternal Order of Police will negotiate on behalf of deputy sheriffs in benefit matters not related to salary.
Title
Prince George's County - Office of the Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Labor Organizations PG 308-23
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 724 |
2023-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2023-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {903027/1 Adopted |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2023-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-30 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB191 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 725
Subjects
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Domestic Violence
Investigations and Inquiries
Local Government Mandates
Prince George's County
Sheriffs
Unions
Domestic Violence
Investigations and Inquiries
Local Government Mandates
Prince George's County
Sheriffs
Unions
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 2 | 330 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |