MD HB439 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a school administrator or official or a school safety coordinator from directing a school resource officer to enforce certain discipline-related policies, rules, regulations, or procedures; prohibiting a school resource officer from unilaterally enforcing certain discipline-related policies, rules, regulations, or procedures; requiring a specialized curriculum for use in training of school resource officers to include training in conduct that is prohibited; etc.
Title
Public Schools - School Resource Officers - Prohibited Conduct
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-8) (Y: 131 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-8) |
2019-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {975968/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-31 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Curriculum
Data
Discipline
Ethics
Job Training
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
School Administration
Students
Committees and Commissions
Curriculum
Data
Discipline
Ethics
Job Training
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
School Administration
Students