MD HB44 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-06 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-06 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the date by which a county governing body must make a request to the State Board of Education for a waiver from the maintenance of effort requirement; requiring the State Board to consider specified factors when making a decision whether to grant a waiver; requiring the State Superintendant of Schools to make a preliminary assessment of waiver applications by a specified time; etc.
Title
Education - Waiver from Maintenance of Effort Requirement - Process and Factors
Sponsors
Del. Kumar Barve [D] | Del. Norman Conway [D] | Del. Sheila Hixson [D] | Del. Marvin Holmes [D] |
Del. Adrienne Jones [D] | Del. Maggie McIntosh [D] | Del. Anthony O'Donnell [R] | Del. Justin Ross [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2011-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (138-1) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-09 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing 2/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-18 | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Appropriations
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Hearings
Notices
Public Schools
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State Aid
Sunset
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Hearings
Notices
Public Schools
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State Aid
Sunset