MD HB443 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering provisions of law relating to individuals required to obtain a criminal history records check; requiring an adult known to be residing in an informal child care provider's home to obtain a criminal history records check; requiring specified informal child care providers to obtain a criminal history records check; etc.
Title
Criminal History Records Checks - Informal Child Care Providers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50 |
2013-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2013-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2013-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-28 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Child Care
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Disclosure
Family Law
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Disclosure
Family Law
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records