MD HB462 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-09 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-09 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a provision of law relating to discrimination in the employment of teachers in the public schools in the State to conform to other provisions of State law governing discrimination in employment.
Title
Education - Discrimination Prohibited - Protected Classes
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Del. Robert Costa [R] | Del. Anne Kaiser [D] | Del. Sue Kullen [D] |
Del. Maggie McIntosh [D] | Del. Heather Mizeur [D] | Del. Shane Pendergrass [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-09 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-12 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-05 | Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (131-3) | |
2010-03-18 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-17 | Special Order 3/18 (Delegate McConkey) Adopted | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-29 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |