MD HB48 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB209
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee; providing that a person has immunity from liability for certain actions related to the Committee; providing for the sharing of information with and confidentiality of information obtained by the Committee; exempting Committee meetings from the Open Meetings Act; and prohibiting certain persons from testifying in any proceeding about details of a Committee meeting.
Title
Public Health - Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80 |
2022-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2022-03-01 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-28 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-01-26 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 3:00 p.m. |
2022-01-26 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-11 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2021-11-01 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB209 (Carry Over) 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
SB94 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
SB94 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Death
Disclosure
Ethics
Health
Health Occupations
Liability
meetings
Mental and Behavioral Health
Open Government
Privacy
Public Health
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Communications
Data
Death
Disclosure
Ethics
Health
Health Occupations
Liability
meetings
Mental and Behavioral Health
Open Government
Privacy
Public Health
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 5 | 637 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 1001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 1003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 1004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 1005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 1006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 1007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 1008 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 1009 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 1 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |