MD HB482 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 600
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 600
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding an unaccompanied homeless youth to the list of individuals who may be eligible for waiver of specified tuition and fees at specified institutions of higher education; requiring a specified administrator to verify that specified youths qualify as independent students under the federal College Cost Reduction and Access Act; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Tuition Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 600 |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {184861/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2014-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Indigent Persons
Local Government Mandates
Reports
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Tuition
Youth
Higher Education Commission
Indigent Persons
Local Government Mandates
Reports
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Tuition
Youth