MD HB490 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-28 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-28 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the holder of a tax sale certificate to be reimbursed for specified postage and mailing expenses that are actually incurred if the property is redeemed before an action to foreclose a right of redemption is filed; and requiring a specified notice of foreclosure to include language indicating that specified postage and mailing expenses are expenses included in the amount necessary to redeem the property if the property is redeemed before an action to foreclose a right of redemption is filed.
Title
Tax Sales - Payment to Redeem Foreclosed Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m. | |
2012-03-17 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2012-03-16 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-15 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-14 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-02 | First Reading Ways and Means |