MD HB490 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain retirees, spouses, and dependent children to elect coverage under the State prescription drug benefit plan; altering to January 1, 2020, the date by which the State is required to discontinue coverage under the State prescription drug benefit plan for certain Medicare-eligible retirees, spouses, and dependent children; exempting certain retirees, spouses, and dependent children from the requirement for the State to terminate coverage under the State prescription drug benefit plan for certain individuals; etc.
Title
State Prescription Drug Benefit Plan - Termination of Coverage for Retirees - Exemptions and Alterations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Beneficiaries
Budget and Management, Department of
Communications
Drugs
Health
Health Insurance
Notices
Retirement Systems
Spouses
State Government - Personnel
State Pensions and Retirement
Support of Dependents
Work, Labor and Employment
Budget and Management, Department of
Communications
Drugs
Health
Health Insurance
Notices
Retirement Systems
Spouses
State Government - Personnel
State Pensions and Retirement
Support of Dependents
Work, Labor and Employment