MD HB491 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-07 - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-07 - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a minimum of $15,000 each sole proprietor registered cemeterian or permit holder operating a conservation cemetery is required to deposit initially into the perpetual care trust fund; requiring the Office of Cemetery Oversight to consider whether the proposed cemetery is certified by the Green Burial Council or an equivalent organization and has been placed in a permanent conservation easement with a qualified land trust in determining whether to designate a cemetery as a conservation cemetery; etc.
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Conservation Cemeteries - Perpetual Care Trust Fund Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-10) (Y: 125 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | Senate | Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-10) |
2015-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {586384/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-11 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Business Regulation and Occupations
Cemeteries
Easements
Environmental Matters
Estates and Trusts
Licenses
Morticians
Prices
Business Regulation and Occupations
Cemeteries
Easements
Environmental Matters
Estates and Trusts
Licenses
Morticians
Prices