MD HB50 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "total real property tax" for purposes of the computation of a certain homeowners' property tax credit; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018.
Title
Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Definition of Total Real Property Tax
Sponsors
Del. Alfred Carr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-10-23 | House | Pre-filed |