MD HB506 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to report certain information regarding the Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2019, and each year thereafter; and requiring the Department, in producing the report, to consult with the Maryland Alliance for the Poor, local health departments, MedChi, the American Academy of Pediatrics Maryland Chapter, the Mid-Atlantic Association of Community Mental Health Centers, and other stakeholders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Department of Health - Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children - Reports

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-2) (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 478
2019-03-26HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-25SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-22SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-22SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-22SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-15SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-11SenateReassigned to Budget and Taxation
2019-03-04SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-03-01HouseThird Reading Passed (136-2)
2019-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {104265/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-02-05HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback