MD HB52 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations from excluding benefits for expenses related to in vitro fertilization procedures performed on a specified surrogate; requiring insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations that provide benefits for pregnancy and childbirth to provide the benefits to a specified surrogate; applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed on or before January 1, 2017; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization, Pregnancy, and Childbirth Services - Surrogate Benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2016-01-28 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-01-28 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2015-10-27 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Health
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Pregnancy
Surrogate Parenting
Women
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Pregnancy
Surrogate Parenting
Women