MD HB520 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified electric companies to file with the Public Service Commission for approval a specified list or voltage survey plan on or before a specified date; requiring an electric company to file a voltage survey plan for Commission approval within a specified period of time; requiring an electric company to conduct specified surveys of specified objects and surfaces within specified contact voltage risk zones at specified times and under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Electric Companies - Contact Voltage - Surveys and Mitigation - The Deanna
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-07 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2012-04-06 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-04-06 | Re-referred Finance | |
2012-03-29 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2012-04-05 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (122-15) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments 263092/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-02-07 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-02 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Emergency Bills
Energy Matters
Equipment
Forests and Parks
High Voltage Lines
Laboratories
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Service Commission
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Street Lights
Utilities
Energy Matters
Equipment
Forests and Parks
High Voltage Lines
Laboratories
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Service Commission
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Street Lights
Utilities