MD HB523 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Court Administrator to assess a $100 fee for the special admission of an out-of-state attorney and to pay $75 of the fee into the Janet L. Hoffman Loan Assistance Repayment Program; requiring funds for the Program to be allocated to specified individuals who have received a graduate degree from a school of law; and providing that funds for the Program include money paid to the Program from the assessment of the fee for the special admission of an out-of-state attorney.
Title
Courts - Fee for the Special Admission of an Out-of-State Attorney - Janet L.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 104 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 104 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-18 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) | |
2011-03-17 | Hearing cancelled (Education Health and Environmental Affairs) | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Education Health and Environmental Affairs) | |
2011-03-11 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings & Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-10 | Third Reading Passed (104-33) | |
2011-03-08 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2011-02-08 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading Judiciary & Ways and Means |
Subjects
Administrative Office of the Courts
Attorneys
Courts
Fees
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Loans
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Attorneys
Courts
Fees
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Loans
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid