MD HB527 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "practice social work" to include counseling for alcohol and drug use and addictive behaviors and to clarify that it includes, for certain individuals, the treatment of biopsychosocial conditions under the supervision of a licensed social worker-clinical; requiring the State Board of Social Work Examiners, under certain circumstances, to approve licensees approved to engage in independent practice to provide supervision; etc.
Title
Health Occupations - Social Workers - Scope of Practice, Supervision, and Application Decision Appeal Process
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2020-03-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {986980/1 Adopted |
2020-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB245 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 543
Subjects
Appeals
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Counselors
Disclosure
Education
Evidence
Examinations
Health
Health Occupations
Hearings
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Postal Service
Reports
Social Services
Social Workers
Substance Abuse
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Counselors
Disclosure
Education
Evidence
Examinations
Health
Health Occupations
Hearings
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Postal Service
Reports
Social Services
Social Workers
Substance Abuse
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 19 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 19 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 19 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |