MD HB536 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reestablishing the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program in the Department of Aging; specifying the purpose of the Program; establishing the Office of the Long-Term Care Ombudsman in the Department; providing for the selection of the State Long-Term Care Ombudsman; establishing specified powers and duties of the Secretary, the State Long-Term Care Ombudsman, and designated ombudsmen; requiring that an ombudsman have access to specified facilities, documents, and records; requiring the Secretary to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Title
Department of Aging - Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2010-03-23 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-22 | First Reading Finance | |
2010-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-19 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-02 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Aging, Department of
Assisted Living
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Crimes and Punishments
Elderly Persons
Liability
Long-Term Care
Nursing Homes
Ombudsmen
Penalties and Sentences
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Aging, Department of
Assisted Living
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Crimes and Punishments
Elderly Persons
Liability
Long-Term Care
Nursing Homes
Ombudsmen
Penalties and Sentences
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations