MD HB536 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that, with specified exceptions, in Montgomery County an on- site sewage disposal system or well located in a rural zone may only serve one additional lot or parcel that has been subdivided from a single property under specified circumstances.
Title
Montgomery County - On-Site Sewage Disposal System and Well Easements - Rural
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-11 | Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-04-11 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-05 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-02-22 | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-08 | First Reading Environmental Matters |