MD HB542 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the list of alcoholic beverages licenses that the Montgomery County Board of License Commissioners may issue in the City of Takoma Park to include a beer and wine sampling or tasting (BWST) license; authorizing the Board to issue a BWST license to a holder of a Class A (off-sale) license in Montgomery County; authorizing holders of a Class A wine license to whom a BWST license has been issued to use the BWST license to hold tastings or samplings of wine only; etc.
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer and Wine Sampling or Tasting
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-04-06 | Special Order until later today (Senator Muse) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Special Order until later today (Senator Muse) Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-31 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-08 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-16 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-08 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fees
Hearings
License Commissioners, Boards of
Montgomery County
Municipal Corporations
Public Information
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fees
Hearings
License Commissioners, Boards of
Montgomery County
Municipal Corporations
Public Information