MD HB544 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that motor carrier safety regulations adopted jointly by the Motor Vehicle Administration and the Department of State Police duplicate or be consistent with specified federal regulations; and clarifying the scope of specified State motor carrier safety regulations.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Motor Carriers - Application of Federal Safety Regulations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-28 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-20 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-16 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-30 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | |
2012-03-13 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-12 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-02-03 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Buses
Federal Government
Motor Vehicle Administration
Rules and Regulations
Safety
State Police, Department of
Trucks
Federal Government
Motor Vehicle Administration
Rules and Regulations
Safety
State Police, Department of
Trucks