MD HB548 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the qualifications established for members of a condominium board of directors from authorizing two individuals who are married to each other to serve as members of the board at the same time; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Condominium Boards of Directors - Membership - Prohibition on Married Couples
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-13 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-29 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |