MD HB55 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB954
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a sole owner of a vessel to designate a beneficiary to take ownership of the vessel on the death of the owner; providing that a beneficiary may be indicated on a certificate of title for a vessel by the words "transfer-on-death" or "TOD" after the name of the registered owner; providing that designating a beneficiary does not affect ownership of a vessel until the death of the owner; authorizing the owner of a vessel to cancel or change the designation of a beneficiary without the consent of the beneficiary; etc.
Title
Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation
Sponsors
Del. Alfred Carr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2020-01-09 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2019-05-15 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB55 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
SB998 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - First Reading Senate Rules
SB998 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - First Reading Senate Rules
Subjects
Beneficiaries
Boats and Ships
Death
Estate Tax
Estates and Trusts
Fees
Identification
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Titles
Vital Records
Boats and Ships
Death
Estate Tax
Estates and Trusts
Fees
Identification
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Titles
Vital Records
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 8 | 715 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 8 | 715.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 8 | 720 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |