MD HB56 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring applicants for a license or certificate from the State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists to submit to a criminal history records check; authorizing the Board to take specified disciplinary actions against specified individuals for failure to submit to a specified criminal history records check; etc.
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348 |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-1) |
2013-03-25 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments {776089/2 Report Adopted |
2013-03-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-01-24 | House | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2012-11-13 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counselors
Counties
Criminal Background Investigations
Discipline
Fees
Fingerprinting
Health Occupations
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Marriage
Mental Health
Patients
Privacy
Reports
Substance Abuse
Counselors
Counties
Criminal Background Investigations
Discipline
Fees
Fingerprinting
Health Occupations
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Marriage
Mental Health
Patients
Privacy
Reports
Substance Abuse