MD HB560 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the hours a holder of a Class B or a Class B-BWL (H-M) beer, wine, and liquor license in Montgomery County may sell beer, wine, and liquor on the day designated by the federal government as a public holiday.
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Hours of Sale MC 8-17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130 |
2017-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2017-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-30 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Federal Government
Holidays and Special Dates
Montgomery County
Retail Sales
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Federal Government
Holidays and Special Dates
Montgomery County
Retail Sales