MD HB560 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Highway Administration, in consultation with appropriate county and municipal authorities, to compile certain best practices for siting, constructing, and maintaining traffic calming devices that address engineering and design and the costs and benefits of the devices; requiring the Administration to coordinate and act as a clearinghouse for best practices, to publish and update information about best practices, and to include estimated costs of construction related to traffic calming devices; etc.
Title
Transportation - State Highway Administration - Traffic Calming Devices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {640716/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Bicycles
Boundaries
Communications
Construction
Counties
Engineers
Equipment
Highways
Motor Vehicle Operation
Municipal Corporations
Pedestrians
Prices
Public Information
Publications
Safety
State Highway Administration
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Boundaries
Communications
Construction
Counties
Engineers
Equipment
Highways
Motor Vehicle Operation
Municipal Corporations
Pedestrians
Prices
Public Information
Publications
Safety
State Highway Administration
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Highways