MD HB564 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the applicability of provisions of the Maryland Uniform Commercial Code governing funds transfers; providing that the provisions apply to a specified remittance transfer except under specified circumstances; and establishing that, in the event of an inconsistency between an applicable provision of the Maryland Uniform Commercial Code governing funds transfers and an applicable provision of the federal Electronic Fund Transfer Act, the federal law governs to the extent of the inconsistency.
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Funds Transfers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-02-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-02-19 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-19 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-18 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-29 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |