MD HB572 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that, for any fiscal year that an appropriation is included in the State budget for a third bridge that crosses the Chesapeake Bay, the Governor include in the budget certain capital grants for each county in which the bridge originates or terminates; requiring that the capital grants equal 25% of the amount appropriated for certain purposes related to the bridge; requiring that a capital grant be used only for infrastructure improvements necessitated by or related to the construction of the bridge; etc.
Title
Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Affected Counties - Infrastructure Funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn |
2020-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation) |
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2020-01-30 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2020-01-30 | House | Hearing canceled (Appropriations) |
2020-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB252 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-23 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Appropriations
Boundaries
Bridges and Tunnels
Budgets
Chesapeake Bay
Construction
Counties
Engineers
Governor
Grants
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Zoning and Planning
Boundaries
Bridges and Tunnels
Budgets
Chesapeake Bay
Construction
Counties
Engineers
Governor
Grants
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 4 | 408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |