MD HB583 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation is prohibited from removing a benefit charge from the earned rating record of an employing unit; requiring, except under specified circumstances, the Secretary to remove benefits charged to a not for profit organization or governmental entity from the account of the not for profit organization or governmental entity under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Relief from Charges for Overpayment of Benefits - Restrictions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121 |
2013-04-02 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2013-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-19 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-19 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2013-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-31 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Counties
Insurance
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Records
Unemployment
Unemployment Insurance
Counties
Insurance
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Records
Unemployment
Unemployment Insurance