MD HB583 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Center for Firearm Violence Prevention and Intervention in the Maryland Department of Health to reduce firearm violence, harm from firearm violence, and misuse of firearms in the State by partnering with federal, State, and local agencies and affected communities to implement a public health approach to firearm violence reduction; requiring the Center to submit to the Governor and the General Assembly by May 1, 2025, a preliminary State Plan for a Public Health Approach to Reducing Firearm Violence; etc.
Title
Center for Firearm Violence Prevention and Intervention - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 103 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 103 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-34) |
2024-04-05 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Third Readings Passed with Amendments (35-11) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Floor Amendment {793723/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (103-34) |
2024-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {983825/1 Adopted |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2024-01-30 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-24 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB475 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-04 - Passed Enrolled
Subjects
Appropriations
Awareness and Outreach
Budgets
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Data
Federal Aid
Governor
Grants
Guns
Health, Department of
Intergovernmental Cooperation
Public Health
Public Safety
Reports
Standards and Best Practices
State Police, Department of
Violence
Awareness and Outreach
Budgets
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Data
Federal Aid
Governor
Grants
Guns
Health, Department of
Intergovernmental Cooperation
Public Health
Public Safety
Reports
Standards and Best Practices
State Police, Department of
Violence
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 13 | 5201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 5202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 5203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 5204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 5205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |