MD HB586 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a company that installs solar photovoltaic systems to install a certain lockout tag containing a safety warning under certain circumstances; and requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to make a certain report to the House Economic Matters Committee and the Senate Finance Committee by December 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety – Solar Photovoltaic Systems – Lockout Tag Requirement and Study

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 279
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {487370/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-04-03SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-03-21SenateHearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-14HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-05HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0586&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0586f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0586t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0586e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_279_hb0586e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0586_48737001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0006/hb0586.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0586_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0556.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0586_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0586_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1588.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1374.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback