MD HB592 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the clerks of the circuit courts and registers of wills to make available to the public information about registering with the State donor registry; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to provide a method by which an individual doing business with the Administration can register as a donor with the State donor registry for a specified purpose and select to have a donor designation on the individual's driver's license or identification card; etc.
Title
State Donor Registry - Information and Methods of Registration - Clerks of Circuit Courts, Registers of Wills, and Motor Vehicle Administration (Enhancing Organ Donation Rates Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-3) (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-3) (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-3) |
2015-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-11 | House | Special Order until 3/12 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted |
2015-03-11 | House | Floor Committee Amendment {343321/1 Adopted |
2015-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {866088/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Clerks of Court
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Drivers' Licenses
Electronic Government
Estates and Trusts
Identification
Motor Vehicle Administration
Notices
Organ Donorship
Public Information
Registers of Wills
Registration
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Drivers' Licenses
Electronic Government
Estates and Trusts
Identification
Motor Vehicle Administration
Notices
Organ Donorship
Public Information
Registers of Wills
Registration
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration