MD HB592 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the number of resident judges of the circuit courts by adding one additional judgeship in Prince George's County.
Title
Prince George's County - Judgeships - Circuit Courts
Sponsors
Del. Luke Clippinger [D] | Del. Nicole Williams [D] | Del. Kent Roberson [D] | Del. Kym Taylor [D] |
Del. Karen Toles [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2024-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-13 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-12 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2024-01-30 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-24 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB688 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 1 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |