MD HB594 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a student loan servicer from employing any scheme, device, or artifice to mislead a student loan borrower; prohibiting a student loan servicer from engaging in any unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice; prohibiting a student loan servicer from knowingly misapplying or refusing to correct a misapplication of payments; requiring a student loan servicer to respond to an inquiry within 30 days of receiving the inquiry or complaint; authorizing the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to enforce the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (105-32) (Y: 105 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 546
2019-04-04HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-03SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-29SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-03-28SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading Passed (105-32)
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {843499/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-26HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-05HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback