MD HB60 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that the appropriate authority of a local pension system offer a special disability retirement allowance to a member if the member is, as determined by the appropriate authority of a local pension system, totally and permanently physically incapacitated for duty arising out of or in the course of the actual performance of duty without willful negligence by the member; exempting the appropriate authority of a local pension system from the requirements of the Act under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement Allowance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-1) |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-14 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-09 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Age
Beneficiaries
Collective Bargaining
Disabilities
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fire Protection
Injury
Interest
Law Enforcement
Local Government - Generally
Negligence
Public Safety
Retirement
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Work, Labor and Employment
Age
Beneficiaries
Collective Bargaining
Disabilities
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fire Protection
Injury
Interest
Law Enforcement
Local Government - Generally
Negligence
Public Safety
Retirement
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 40 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |