MD HB604 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Juvenile Services to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2014, on the implementation of a system of graduated responses for children under the jurisdiction of the Department.
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Graduated Responses - Report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2013-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2013-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-31 | House | First Reading Judiciary |