MD HB607 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-29 - Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-29 - Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission to enter on specified real property, the common area of a specified multifamily building, or a specified commercial building at reasonable times to post a notice on or near the entry door of the building or unit under specified circumstances; requiring the Commission to contact and consult with a property manager or owner of property before entering real property to mutually agree on specified matters except in the case of emergency; etc.
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Customer Notices
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-23 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-03-04 | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-09 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Notices
Sewage
Utilities
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Water
Construction
Notices
Sewage
Utilities
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Water