MD HB607 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that applicants for a Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship are not subject to certain requirements of the scholarship application process if the applicant enrolls in a noncredit vocational certificate program, enrolls in a sequence of noncredit courses leading to licensure or certification, or participates in a registered apprenticeship program.
Title
Community Colleges - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship - Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355 |
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2024-02-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments {713422/1 Adopted |
2024-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2024-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m. |
2024-01-25 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB1141 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-05 - Rereferred to Appropriations
Subjects
Apprentices
Certifications
Community Colleges
Higher Education
Licenses
Residency
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Certifications
Community Colleges
Higher Education
Licenses
Residency
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid