MD HB625 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person in Carroll County to hunt deer on the last three Sundays in October and the second Sunday in November on private property with a bow and arrow; and removing Carroll County from the list of counties in which deer hunting on private property on specified Sundays is prohibited.
Title
Carroll County - Deer Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (46-1) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-24 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (123-10) | |
2011-03-20 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-20 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-02-17 | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-09 | First Reading Environmental Matters |